This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 16:04:47 (UTC).

M. R. VS DOE 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 M R filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOE 1,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0974

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. M.

Defendants

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES A CORPORATION SOLE

IMMACULATE HEART OF MARY ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE A CORPORATION SOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELTON JUSTIN R.

Defendant Attorney

NATELBORG KENNETH MARK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

7/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

6/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

Unknown - JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER BY PARTIES TO TRANSFER AND ADD-ON TO JCCP NO. 5101

5/26/2023: Unknown - JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER BY PARTIES TO TRANSFER AND ADD-ON TO JCCP NO. 5101

Case Management Statement

5/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/17/2023: Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Case Management Statement

5/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/10/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/10/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/10/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/4/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL CERTIFICATE OF MERIT)

3/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL CERTIFICATE OF MERIT)

Order - ORDER SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND CORROBORATIVE FACT, PERMITTING SERVICE ON DOE DEFENDANTS, PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED UNDER

3/2/2023: Order - ORDER SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND CORROBORATIVE FACT, PERMITTING SERVICE ON DOE DEFENDANTS, PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED UNDER

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/25/2023 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference Re: Bellwether Deposition Protocol)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference Re: Bellwether Deposition Protocol)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: M. R. (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1 (Defendant); DOE 2 (Defendant); DOE 3 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: M. R. (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1 (Defendant); DOE 2 (Defendant); DOE 3 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: M. R. (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1 (Defendant); DOE 2 (Defendant); DOE 3 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less