This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:20:11 (UTC).

LYRIC SANTOS ET AL VS LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by LYRIC SANTOS against LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7290

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

COLIN L. POWELL ACADEMY FOR SUCCESS

SUCCESS COLIN L. POWELL ACADEMY FOR

Guardian Ad Litem

PORTER LANELL

Minor

SANTOS LYRIC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND COLIN L POWELL ACADEMY FOR SUCCESS TO PLAINTIFF''S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/25/2018: ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND COLIN L POWELL ACADEMY FOR SUCCESS TO PLAINTIFF''S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

6/5/2018: PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/16/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS

3/20/2018: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/8/2018: PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Long Beach Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Lanell Porter (Legacy Party); Lyric Santos (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Long Beach Unified School District (Defendant); Colin L. Powell Academy for Success (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND COLIN L POWELL ACADEMY FOR SUCCESS TO PLAINTIFF''S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lyric Santos (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lyric Santos (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697290    Hearing Date: March 19, 2020    Dept: 29

Santos et al. v. Long Beach Unified School District et al. BC697290

Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor’s Compromise to Approve Compromise of Pending Action is CONTINUED to 05/06/2020 at 1:30 p.m.

The Order to Show Cause Re:  Dismissal set for 05/04/2020 is advance and CONTINUED to 05/06/2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, the court finds good cause to continue the hearing.

The Court is ordered to give notice.