This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 18:05:05 (UTC).

LYNN SHAWCROFT VS GALPIN FORD STUDIO RENTALS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 LYNN SHAWCROFT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GALPIN FORD STUDIO RENTALS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0212

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAWCROFT LYNN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GALPIN FORD STUDIO RENTALS

ARTS AND SCIENCES DEPARTMENT LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

AREVALO ERIC

Other Attorneys

COHEN RANDAL NEAL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/9/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/29/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/30/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Galpin Motors, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Galpin Ford Studio Rentals (Defendant); Arts and Sciences Department, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Galpin Motors, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Galpin Ford Studio Rentals (Defendant); Arts and Sciences Department, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Galpin Motors, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Galpin Ford Studio Rentals (Defendant); Arts and Sciences Department, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lynn Shawcroft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Lynn Shawcroft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lynn Shawcroft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lynn Shawcroft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lynn Shawcroft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARTS AND SCIENCES DEPARTMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GALPIN FORD STUDIO RENTALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN, RANDAL NEAL