This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 10:04:17 (UTC).

LYNN ONISHI VS GLEN UYECHI

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 LYNN ONISHI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLEN UYECHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0568

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONISHI LYNN

Defendant

UYECHI GLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODKIN DANIEL L.

Defendant Attorney

LEON CHRISTOPHER PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/3/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

10/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/3/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

11/14/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • Hearing10/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (3-5 Day Estimate) scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 updated: Result Date to 01/03/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Glen Uyechi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Lynn Onishi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LYNN ONISHI (Plaintiff); As to: GLEN UYECHI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LYNN ONISHI (Plaintiff); As to: GLEN UYECHI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LYNN ONISHI (Plaintiff); As to: GLEN UYECHI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less