This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 02:10:17 (UTC).

LYNN HOCK VS KYLE ZANNOCCO MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 LYNN HOCK filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KYLE ZANNOCCO MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9799

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOCK LYNN

Defendants

DEL PORTILLO LUZ M.D.

ZANNOCCO KYLE M.D.

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

AARDEMA GARY M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

IRWIN GABRIEL M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/31/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/22/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/22/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

3/22/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration

3/22/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/22/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/22/2019: Declaration

Separate Statement

3/22/2019: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

3/22/2019: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/22/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Stipulation and Order

5/15/2019: Stipulation and Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/4/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/4/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

ANSWER OF L1JZ DEL PORTILLO, M.D. AND KYLE ZANOCCO, M.D. TO COMPLAINT

4/6/2018: ANSWER OF L1JZ DEL PORTILLO, M.D. AND KYLE ZANOCCO, M.D. TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

3/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

2/8/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (stip and order to continue trial); Filed by Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Evidence in Suport); Filed by Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Kyle, M.D. Zannocco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Kyle, M.D. Zannocco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Evidence in Support); Filed by Kyle, M.D. Zannocco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lynn Hock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lynn Hock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Lynn Hock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES: (PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE/ MEDICAL MALPRACTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lynn Hock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

For Court Use -

FILED

Superior Court of California County of Los Argeles

AARDEMA & LONDON

6355 TOPANGA CANYON BLVD., STE. 518 WOODLAND HILLS, CA, 91367

SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN 98 BC689799

1. At the time of servicz | was at least |8 yearsparty 10 this action.

I served copies of the SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT 4TH/7TH AMMENDED GENERAL ORDER, ADR PACKET.

3. a. Party served: LUZ DEL PORTILLO, M.D., an Individual b. Person served. SANDY MEDINA (F, Hlspamc 55, 5"6, 170, Blond Hair, Brown Eyes)

23388 MULHOLLAND DRIVE

4. Address where the party was served: WOODLAND HILLS, CA 91364

5. Iserved the party: b. by substitute service. On Feb 23 2018 at 3:45 pm by leaving the copies with or in the presence of: SANDY MEDINA (F, Hispanic, 55, 5"6, 170, Blond Hair, Brown Eyes)

(1) (Business) A person at least 18 years of age apparently in charge at the office or usual place of busmess of the person to be served. I

informedgeneral nature of the papers. (4) 1 thereafter mailed (by first-class, postage prepaid) copies of the documents to the person to be served at the place where the copies were left

(Code Civ. Proc. 415.20) T mailed the documents on 02/26/2018 from Los Angeles. (5) l attached a declaration of diligence stating actions taken first to attempt personal service.

6. The "Notice to the Person Served" (on the Summons)iwas eomp?eled as follows:

a. as an Individual Defendant

Recoverabie Cost Per CCP 1033.5(a4)X8B) d. The Fee jor Service was: $50.00 e. lam: (3) registered California process server

7. Person Who Served Papers:

a. Tamar Ravid b. BytheBookAttorneyService

3637 Glendon Avenue Suite 203 (i) Owmer Los Angeles, CA 90034 (i) Registration No.: 5967 (iii) County: Los Angeles

c. (818)445-7448 (v) Expiration Date:

.‘Jdeclal;g

Date: 02/27/2018 @ - !’ -———m—*———————

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AARDEMA GARY MICHAEL