This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 14:12:03 (UTC).

LYNN GARDINER VS DOE 1, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 LYNN GARDINER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1058

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDINER LYNN

Defendants

2 AN INDIVIDUAL DOE

DOE 1 A PUBLIC ENTITY

BOWDEN RANDALL

LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Cross Defendant and Defendant

BOWDEN RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

ROSE ALEC SCOTT

MCCUNE DANA JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/30/2023

5/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/30/2023

Case Management Statement

5/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/17/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/17/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/28/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

3/28/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/17/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTI...) OF 02/14/2023

2/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTI...) OF 02/14/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTI...)

2/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTI...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND GRANTING PERMISSION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

2/8/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND GRANTING PERMISSION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

2/7/2023: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION REDACTED DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHA AND CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACTS SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL

2/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION REDACTED DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHA AND CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACTS SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer of Long Beach Unified School District to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Name Extension: of Long Beach Unified School District to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ; As To Parties changed from Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff) to Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint of Defendant Long Beach Unified School District: Name Extension: of Defendant Long Beach Unified School District ; As To Parties changed from Randall Bowden (Defendant) to Randall Bowden (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 05/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 updated: Result Date to 05/30/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Long Beach Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lodging Notice of Lodging documents under seal; Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate Certificate of Merit re DOE 1; Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate Certificate of Merit of Mental Health Professional; Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate Certificate of Merit re DOE 2; Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lynn Gardiner (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less