This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 07:45:11 (UTC).

LYNN DYMALLY VS KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 LYNN DYMALLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4637

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYMALLY LYNN

Defendant

KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPECTOR BENNETT A.

Defendant Attorney

GASKINS JORDAN R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/9/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/19/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

1/21/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LYNN DYMALLY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LYNN DYMALLY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LYNN DYMALLY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LYNN DYMALLY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LYNN DYMALLY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY D/B/A HAMER TOYOTA DBA HAMER TOYOTA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPECTOR BENNETT A