This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:28:39 (UTC).

LYNN ANDREA COUCH VS A. G. LAYNE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 LYNN ANDREA COUCH filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against A G LAYNE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9989

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUCH LYNN ANDREA

Defendants

A. G. LAYNE INC.

BRENNTAG GREAT LAKES LLC

CHEVRON PHILLIPS LLC

FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC

MONUMENT CHEMICAL HOUSTON LLC DBA HALTERMANN SOLUTIONS A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SIGMA-ALDRICH CO. LLC

UNIVAR SOLUTIONS USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAN ABRAHAM

METZGER RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/20/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/20/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

6/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 06/30/2022

6/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 06/30/2022

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 07/06/2022

7/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 07/06/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

7/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docketat 1:29 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 07/06/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docketat 11:55 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 06/30/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Posting Jury Fees); Filed by Lynn Andrea Couch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.G. LAYNE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sigma-Aldrich Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP is a litigant