This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 09:39:25 (UTC).

LYNETTE RANASINGHE VS SUREN VAZGENOVICH GINOSYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 LYNETTE RANASINGHE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUREN VAZGENOVICH GINOSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7543

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANASINGHE LYNETTE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GARCIA ADALBERTO ESTEBAN LOPEZ

GINOSYAN SUREN VAZGENOVICH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GINOSYAN SUREN VAZGENOVICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER JEFFREY

Other Attorneys

LIBMAN MICHAEL JACOB

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/11/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/7/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

4/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/15/2021: Answer

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

9/20/2021: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Hearing06/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by SUREN VAZGENOVICH GINOSYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SUREN VAZGENOVICH GINOSYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SUREN VAZGENOVICH GINOSYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LYNETTE RANASINGHE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIBMAN MICHAEL JACOB