This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 09:04:02 (UTC).

LYNETTE POWELL VS. VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 LYNETTE POWELL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7329

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POWELL LYNETTE AN INDIVIDUAL

POWELL LYNETTE

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC.

VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIERINGER LAW GROUP

MCGRATH JON JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS D'AMATO BRISBOIS & BISGAARD

BARBER JOHN LONGYEAR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

1/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

1/14/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

1/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Notice of Ruling

6/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

5/30/2019: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2019

4/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2019

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Case Management Statement

2/13/2019: Case Management Statement

General Denial -

9/26/2018: General Denial -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

8/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Summons -

8/2/2018: Summons -

Notice of Case Management Conference -

8/2/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference -

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

8/2/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

8/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Notice of Case Management Conference -

8/2/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference -

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

8/2/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

Complaint -

8/2/2018: Complaint -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial (, time estimate is 3 to 4 days,) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Entire Action With Prejudice); Filed by LYNETTE POWELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by LYNETTE POWELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by LYNETTE POWELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by LYNETTE POWELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARBER JOHN L.