This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 03:11:58 (UTC).

LYNETTE LOVE ET AL VS JULIAN ALVAREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by LYNETTE LOVE against JULIAN ALVAREZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2554

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MONDE RAFAEL

LOVE LYNETTE

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ALVAREZ MARIA

MONDE RAFAEL

LOVE LYNETTE

VALADEZ JEORGE

Defendants and Respondents

ALVAREZ JULIAN

DOES 1 - 25

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS BRIAN D. SOASH AND TELLER1A, TELLERIA & LEVY, LLP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2018: DEFENDANTS BRIAN D. SOASH AND TELLER1A, TELLERIA & LEVY, LLP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/29/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO JULIAN ALVAREZ MARIA ALVAREZ AND JEORGE VALADEZ TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/29/2018: ANSWER TO JULIAN ALVAREZ MARIA ALVAREZ AND JEORGE VALADEZ TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/10/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/1/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

SUMMONS

4/18/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLALNT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGES)

4/18/2018: COMPLALNT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Rafael Monde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Rafael Monde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Julian Alvarez (Defendant); Maria Alvarez (Defendant); Jeorge Valadez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Julian Alvarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ANSWER TO JULIAN ALVAREZ MARIA ALVAREZ AND JEORGE VALADEZ TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Julian Alvarez (Defendant); Maria Alvarez (Defendant); Jeorge Valadez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DEFENDANTS BRIAN D. SOASH AND TELLER1A, TELLERIA & LEVY, LLP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lynette Love (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lynette Love (Plaintiff); Rafael Monde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • COMPLALNT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Lynette Love (Plaintiff); Rafael Monde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702554    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

lynette love, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

julian alvarez, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC702554

Hearing Date: March 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion for terminating sanctions

Defendants move for terminating sanctions against Plaintiff. However, Plaintiff filed a notice of settlement on March 10, 2020. Therefore, the Court takes the motion off-calendar as moot and sets an OSC re: Settlement and Dismissal for April 30, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: March 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC702554    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

lynette love, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

julian alvarez, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.: BC702554

Hearing Date: February 6, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Christopher Gaddini, Esq. (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Rafael Monde (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. That is a valid basis for withdrawal.

On its own motion, the Court vacates the final status conference, currently set for March 5, 2020, and the trial date, currently set for March 17, 2020. The Court sets a trial setting conference for March 13, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. In the event the Court denies the motion for terminating sanctions, it will set new dates for the final status conference and trial.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proof of service of a signed copy of the updated the order on Plaintiff. Counsel will remain attorney of record until Counsel files with the Court proof of service of the signed order. Counsel must serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days.

Counsel is to give notice, and file proof of service of such.

DATED: February 6, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC702554    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

lynette love, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

julian alvarez, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.: BC702554

Hearing Date: January 6, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Christopher Gaddini, Esq. (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Rafael Monde (“Plaintiff”). The proof of service Counsel has submitted with the motion does not reflect service on Plaintiff. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice for failure to give proper notice. Counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 6, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC702554    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

LYNETTE LOVE, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

JULIAN ALVAREZ, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC702554

Hearing Date: December 19, 2019

[Tentative] order RE:

DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF

Defendants Julian Alvarez, Maria Alvarez, and Jeorge Valadez (“Defendants”) have filed motions to compel responses from Plaintiff Rafael Monde (“Plaintiff”) for Form Interrogatories (Set One) (“FROGS”) and Request for Production of Documents (Set One) (“RPD”).

On December 18, 2018, Defendants served this discovery on Plaintiff, meaning that the responses were due on or before January 22, 2019. On June 21, 2019, Defendants’ counsel sent a meet-and-confer letter and requested discovery responses without objections by July 8, 2019. Plaintiff failed to respond. On August 5, 2019, Defendants’ counsel served another meet-and-confer letter, to no avail. Then, on November 5, 2019, Defendants’ counsel sent an email inquiring about the discovery responses, also to no avail. Plaintiff has not opposed the motion, and there is nothing in the record suggesting Plaintiff has complied with her discovery obligations. Therefore, Defendants’ motions to compel responses to the FROG and RPD are GRANTED. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) Plaintiff Rafael Monde shall serve verified responses to Defendants’ form interrogatories and request for production of documents, without objections, within twenty (20) days of notice of this order.

Defendants seek sanctions against Plaintiff (but not Plaintiff’s counsel) in the total amount of $1,150.60. The Court finds that the failure to respond to discovery, especially over such an extended period of time, is an abuse of the discovery process warranting sanctions. The Court finds that this amount is reasonable to cover Defendant’s expenses relating to these motions. Therefore, the Court orders Plaintiff to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,150.60.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Defendant’s motion to compel. Plaintiff shall serve verified responses to Defendants’ form interrogatories and request for production of documents, without objections, within twenty (20) days of notice of this order. Plaintiff shall pay sanctions to Defendant in the amount of $1,150.60 within twenty (20) days of notice of this order. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 19, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court