Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 14:37:23 (UTC).

LYLE H DAVIS VS SOSE HANNEYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 LYLE H DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOSE HANNEYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3128

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS LYLE H

Defendants

HANNEYAN SOSE

HANNEYAN RAFFI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLETTI MICHAEL A.

Defendant Attorney

KIM STEVE

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

12/7/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Demand for Jury Trial

12/10/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/11/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

11/10/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/10/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Hearing05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sose Hanneyan (Defendant); Raffi Hanneyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sose Hanneyan (Defendant); Raffi Hanneyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lyle H Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lyle H Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lyle H Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lyle H Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLETTI MICHAEL A. ESQ.