Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2021 at 02:00:52 (UTC).

LYDIA VARGAS VS ULYSSES ANGEL RUIZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 LYDIA VARGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ULYSSES ANGEL RUIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0499

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS LYDIA

Defendants

TREEIUM INC.

RUIZ ULYSSES ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN DANIEL

BAUMAN SHAUN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

FLORES ZOJEILA I.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

11/5/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

8/27/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/22/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Hearing09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Lydia Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ulysses Angel Ruiz (Defendant); Treeium Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lydia Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lydia Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lydia Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lydia Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lydia Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TREEIUM INC. A WYOMING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES ZOJEILA