This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 07:55:18 (UTC).

LYDIA CARDENAS VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2017 LYDIA CARDENAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, RUPERT A. BYRDSONG and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8501

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CARDENAS LYDIA

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

COMMERCE CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF COMMERCE

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

MONCAYO DOE 1 YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS ALLEN L. ESQ.

MARYANSKI DONNA

THOMAS ALLEN

THOMAS ALLEN LEE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion

8/13/2019: Notice of Motion

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITIONTOPLAINTIFFSMOTIONTOAMEND

8/21/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITIONTOPLAINTIFFSMOTIONTOAMEND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR L...)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR L...)

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/25/2019: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

10/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

Request for Judicial Notice

10/24/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/24/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/4/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFSOPPTODEFDEMURRER

11/7/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFSOPPTODEFDEMURRER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 11/18/2019

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 11/18/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

11/18/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

Order - ORDER BY THE COURT TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AS COMPLICATED PI

11/18/2019: Order - ORDER BY THE COURT TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AS COMPLICATED PI

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/21/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRANSFER OF PERSONAL INJURY COMPLICATED CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT COURT CALENDAR

11/25/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRANSFER OF PERSONAL INJURY COMPLICATED CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT COURT CALENDAR

Request for Judicial Notice

11/27/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

11/27/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/27/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • Hearing10/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Hearing10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Agreement at IDC); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketJoint Informal Discovery Conference Statement; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Yolanda Moncayo (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; DECLARATION OF ALLEN L. THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lydia Cardenas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lydia Cardenas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lydia Cardenas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ET SEQ.; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8501    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

LYDIA CARDENAS,

Plaintiff,

v.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****8501

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE BYRDSONG presiding in DEPT. 28 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 18, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF COMMERCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ALLEN L. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ALLEN