This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 03:20:46 (UTC).

LYDIA ACEVEDO FLORES VS SHASON INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 LYDIA ACEVEDO FLORES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SHASON INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8986

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACEVEDO FLORES LYDIA

Defendants

CAMACHO MARIO

SHASON INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS H.

Defendant Attorney

MOGHADDAMI ALI R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

10/22/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/25/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/22/2021

10/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/24/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATI

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATI

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

6/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE HEARING PROOF OF SERVICE

6/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE HEARING PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/8/2021: Answer

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Hearing03/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by SHASON INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Informati); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Lydia Acevedo Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lydia Acevedo Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lydia Acevedo Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lydia Acevedo Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lydia Acevedo Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHASON INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.