This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 18:18:57 (UTC).

LVOV, SERGEY VS. GOGINA, DIANA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 LVOV, SERGEY filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against GOGINA, DIANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AHARONOV, AMIR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1412

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AHARONOV, AMIR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LVOV SERGEY

Respondent

GOGINA DIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KHOURY HYSUMI

Respondent Attorneys

AYZENSTEIN MARINA

STERNBERG CAROL

 

Court Documents

Order - SIGNED 11/16/21 Stipulation and Order

11/16/2021: Order - SIGNED 11/16/21 Stipulation and Order

Request - Dismissal

1/19/2022: Request - Dismissal

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

10/28/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proposed - Stipulation and Order

11/15/2021: Proposed - Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

11/17/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/13/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Substitution of Attorney - atty: C Sternberg - out atty: M. Ayzenstein - in

9/30/2021: Substitution of Attorney - atty: C Sternberg - out atty: M. Ayzenstein - in

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/10/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/10/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Response - Domestic Violence

9/14/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/15/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

9/15/2021: Minute Order

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/14/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - DV-109, DV-120, DV-110

9/2/2021: Proof of Service - DV-109, DV-120, DV-110

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/23/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

8/23/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child

8/23/2021: Petition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder (SIGNED 11/16/21 Stipulation and Order ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (atty: C Sternberg - out atty: M. Ayzenstein - in ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHOURY HYSUMI