This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 15:18:35 (UTC).

LUZELENA HERRERA VS BERTHA MEZA

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 LUZELENA HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BERTHA MEZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4561

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA LUZELENA

Defendant

MEZA BERTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVAK SEAN M

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/8/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LUZELENA HERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LUZELENA HERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LUZELENA HERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVAK SEAN M