This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2022 at 04:15:18 (UTC).

LUZ OLIVARES VS TACO BELL CANTINA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 LUZ OLIVARES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TACO BELL CANTINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL FEENEY, FREDERICK C. SHALLER and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3095

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JILL FEENEY

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVARES LUZ

Defendant

TACO BEACH CANTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FINE EDWARD S.

FINK ROBERT S.

Defendant Attorney

LEON LUCIO OCEGUEDA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

10/18/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/31/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/25/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/11/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ALL STATUTORY DEADLINES AND TO SCHEDULE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

6/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ALL STATUTORY DEADLINES AND TO SCHEDULE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Association of Attorney

7/11/2019: Association of Attorney

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -1ST

8/9/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -1ST

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/5/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/5/2019: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/16/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/24/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff); Taco Beach Cantina (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by Taco Beach Cantina (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Taco Beach Cantina (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Taco Beach Cantina (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Taco Beach Cantina (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (-1st); Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Luz Olivares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEON LUCIO