This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 00:07:35 (UTC).

LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC VS EILEEN PAULINE S. MARTINEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EILEEN PAULINE S MARTINEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1056

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS LLC DBA LUXURY LEASE COMPANY

Defendants

BVA HOSPICE CARE INC.

MARTINEZ EILEEN PAULINE S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOLAR ELIZABETH L.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/2/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC on 11/02/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EILEEN PAULINE S. MARTINEZ (Defendant); BVA HOSPICE CARE, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EILEEN PAULINE S. MARTINEZ (Defendant); BVA HOSPICE CARE, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EILEEN PAULINE S. MARTINEZ (Defendant); BVA HOSPICE CARE, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LUXURY LEASE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EILEEN PAULINE S. MARTINEZ (Defendant); BVA HOSPICE CARE, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less