This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 05:32:37 (UTC).

LUO, SHIOUCHI VS CHAI, ERIC CHONG MING

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 LUO, SHIOUCHI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHAI, ERIC CHONG MING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0817

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUO SHIOUCHI

Respondent

CHAI ERIC CHONG MING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LIU KEVIN L

HWU FRANK S

 

Court Documents

Judgment

9/14/2020: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

9/18/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Notice - of disassociation of counsel

9/21/2020: Notice - of disassociation of counsel

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

7/27/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

7/27/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

7/27/2020: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Mailed to Respondent on 8/3/2020

7/27/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Mailed to Respondent on 8/3/2020

Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - Rejected 8/3/2020

7/27/2020: Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - Rejected 8/3/2020

Proof of Service of Summons

7/27/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

7/27/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/18/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Income and Expense

6/18/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

6/18/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/18/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/18/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

6/18/2020: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

6/18/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of disassociation of counsel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (Rejected 8/3/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Mailed to Respondent on 8/3/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HWU FRANK S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIU KEVIN L