This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 09:12:16 (UTC).

LUM, HUBERT - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 LUM, HUBERT - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6533

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUM HENRY

Decedent

LUM HUBERT

Not Classified By Court

SETTLE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

7/1/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Will Deposited - 7 pgs - Dated - 07/31/2018

7/7/2021: Will Deposited - 7 pgs - Dated - 07/31/2018

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7/13/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/20/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

8/24/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

8/26/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

Letters (Initial)

9/1/2021: Letters (Initial)

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

9/7/2021: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

Minute Order - (corrected NPT 9/7/21)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - (corrected NPT 9/7/21)

Will - Admitted

8/18/2021: Will - Admitted

Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors

12/7/2021: Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Administration to Creditors (Notice - Administration to Creditors )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (7 pgs - Dated - 07/31/2018 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHN RICHARD ANTON