This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 12:25:40 (UTC).

LUKE KENNEY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 LUKE KENNEY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7026

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Not Classified By Court

BARZAN PIERPAOLO

FRIZELL JERRY

GONZALEZ ARTHUR

KENNEY COURTNEY

KUKURUDZ ALEXANDER

KUZMINOVA MARIA

SALIE FUJIKO

BARZAN GUARDIAN AD LITEM TO MINOR ALBERTO BARZAN PIERPAOLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SINGLETON GERALD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/20/2022: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

6/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 06/06/2022

6/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 06/06/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

6/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/20/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/20/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Unknown - DECLARATION OF C. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF C. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/10/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

8/10/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ALBERTO BARZAN)

6/28/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ALBERTO BARZAN)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of C. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketProof Of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company And Edison International?s Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company And Edison International?s Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address; Filed by Gerald Singleton (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Alberto Barzan)); Filed by Alberto Barzan, by and through Guardian Ad Litem Pierpaolo Barzan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order re Complex Determination); Filed by Luke Kenney (Plaintiff); Alberto Barzan, by and through Guardian Ad Litem Pierpaolo Barzan (Plaintiff); Allegra Barzan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docketat 2:25 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Determination) of 06/06/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luke Kenney (Plaintiff); Courtney Kenney (Non-Party); Alberto Barzan, by and through Guardian Ad Litem Pierpaolo Barzan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luke Kenney (Plaintiff); Courtney Kenney (Non-Party); Alberto Barzan, by and through Guardian Ad Litem Pierpaolo Barzan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER