Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:46:53 (UTC).

LUIZ FELIPE MARTINS VS HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 LUIZ FELIPE MARTINS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7400

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINS LUIZ FELIPE

Defendants and Respondents

HOOMAN NISAN OF LONG BEACH

DOES 1 TO 20

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INCORPORATION DBA HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KIM SAM

KIM SAM K

Defendant Attorney

MCCREARY DUNCAN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

Notice

2/14/2018: Notice

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/5/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice

3/27/2018: Notice

Declaration

3/27/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

4/10/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

Other -

7/25/2018: Other -

Other -

9/7/2018: Other -

Minute Order

9/13/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/25/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/20/2019: Notice

Unknown

4/10/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/18/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

12/20/2017: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1) RECOVERY OF UNPAID WAGES; ETC

12/20/2017: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1) RECOVERY OF UNPAID WAGES; ETC

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Luiz Felipe Martins (Plaintiff); HNL automotive Incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice (of Hearing and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice); Filed by Luiz Felipe Martins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation and Proposed Order ...) of 03/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation and Proposed Order ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 11:30 AM in Department 10; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Notice -NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Luiz Felipe Martins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 322; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Order -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1) RECOVERY OF UNPAID WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Luiz Felipe Martins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 61) is a litigant

Latest cases where HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCREARY DUNCAN