This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2019 at 02:53:18 (UTC).

LUIS ROBERTO MENDOZA LEZAMA ET AL VS FRANK ARTHUR BAL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 LUIS ROBERTO MENDOZA LEZAMA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANK ARTHUR BAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0629

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA-LEZAMA LUIS ROBERTO

Defendant

BAL FRANK ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOOTHE DENNIS HOWARD

ALDER C MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

NETTELS CHARLES FREDRICK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

10/20/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

10/20/2017: SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/12/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/22/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

6/22/2018: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Notice of Ruling

2/26/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, FSC, disco...)

2/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, FSC, disco...)

Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FRANK ARTHUR BAI'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/22/2019: Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FRANK ARTHUR BAI'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, DISCOVERY, AND EXPERT CUTOFF DATES; DECLARATION OF AMELIA McDONALD, ESQ.; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA WHITE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/20/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, DISCOVERY, AND EXPERT CUTOFF DATES; DECLARATION OF AMELIA McDONALD, ESQ.; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA WHITE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT

8/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/13/2019

8/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/13/2019

Notice of Settlement

8/12/2019: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Roberto Mendoza-Lezama (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal After Settlement); Filed by Luis Roberto Mendoza-Lezama (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement;) of 08/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Luis Roberto Mendoza-Lezama (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Luis Roberto Mendoza-Lezama (Plaintiff); VERONICA (Dismissed) CORTEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Frank Arthur Bal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Frank Arthur Bal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Luis Roberto Mendoza-Lezama (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Roberto Mendoza-Lezama (Plaintiff); VERONICA (Dismissed) CORTEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NETTELS CHARLES F. ESQ.