This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 01:47:02 (UTC).

LUIS QUINTANILLA, ET AL. VS ADEKUNLE ADEDOTUN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 LUIS QUINTANILLA, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADEKUNLE ADEDOTUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2113

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMEZ LUIS

QUINTANILLA LUIS

Defendant

ADEDOTUN ADEKUNLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/31/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

1/31/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

1/31/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2025
  • Hearing01/28/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2024
  • Hearing07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2024
  • Hearing07/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/28/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Quintanilla (Plaintiff); Luis Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Adekunle Adedotun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Luis Quintanilla (Plaintiff); Luis Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Adekunle Adedotun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Quintanilla (Plaintiff); Luis Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Adekunle Adedotun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less