Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 02:53:23 (UTC).

LUIS MARTIN VS RM EL TORITO LLC

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 LUIS MARTIN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RM EL TORITO LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1646

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN LUIS

Defendant

RM EL TORITO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGALLANES DAYTON

Defendant Attorney

PISANO CHRISTOPHER MARK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/23/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

1/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/7/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

11/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/23/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (REJECTED); Filed by Luis Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by FM Restaurant El Torito Opco, LLC Erroneously Sued As RM El Torito LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RM EL TORITO LLC (DOE 1) is a litigant