This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 14:14:46 (UTC).

LUIS MARQUEZ VS NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 LUIS MARQUEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1242

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARQUEZ LUIS

Defendant

NORTHGATE GONZALEZ LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER MARK DEE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/8/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Settlement

1/23/2023: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/24/2023

1/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/24/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 01/24/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Luis Marquez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Luis Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/07/2023; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Luis Marquez (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less