This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2022 at 12:31:41 (UTC).

LUIS MANUEL RAMOS FLORES, VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 LUIS MANUEL RAMOS FLORES, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0993

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS FLORES LUIS MANUEL

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer - ANSWER GENERAL MOTORS LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/26/2022: Answer - ANSWER GENERAL MOTORS LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer GENERAL MOTORS LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant); As to: Luis Manuel Ramos Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Luis Manuel Ramos Flores (Plaintiff): First Name changed from LUIS to Luis; Last Name changed from RAMOS FLORES, to Ramos Flores; Middle Name changed from MANUEL to Manuel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- General Motors LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company to General Motors LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LUIS MANUEL RAMOS FLORES, (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/26/2022; Service Cost: 73.94; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LUIS MANUEL RAMOS FLORES, (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LUIS MANUEL RAMOS FLORES, (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LUIS MANUEL RAMOS FLORES, (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAR DARSHNIK