This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2020 at 03:55:42 (UTC).

LUIS LOPEZ VS TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 LUIS LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2874

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOPEZ LUIS

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 10

BAPKO METAL INC.

AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Defendant and Cross Defendant

BAPKO METAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTEVIDEO JOHN A. ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH KEITH E.

POWERS AMY

CHAPMAN ARTHUR

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

SMITH KEITH EVAN

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/21/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES PER STIPULATION

12/19/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES PER STIPULATION

Notice - AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF RULING RE EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES PER STIPULATION

12/19/2019: Notice - AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF RULING RE EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES PER STIPULATION

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/14/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/25/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

10/25/2019: Separate Statement

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT, BAPKO METAL, (SUED AS DOE 1) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/19/2019: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT, BAPKO METAL, (SUED AS DOE 1) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice - DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF CO

8/9/2019: Notice - DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF CO

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION

8/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COURTNEY JAKOFSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAGE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COURTNEY JAKOFSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAGE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/16/2019: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

4/11/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

8/24/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LUIS LOPEZS COMPLAINT

5/24/2018: DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LUIS LOPEZS COMPLAINT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Hearing10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Turner Construction Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Luis Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by American Stair Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice (of taking MSJ off calendar); Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LUIS LOPEZS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Luis Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Luis Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Luis Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692874    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

LUIS LOPEZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC692874

Hearing Date: January 8, 2020

[Tentative] order RE:

DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Defendant Turner Construction Company (“Defendant”) filed a motion for summary judgment. However, Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal against Defendant. Therefore, the motion for summary judgment is taken off-calendar.

DATED: January 8, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court