This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2021 at 12:11:53 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA VS ACTIVE NETWORK, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 LUIS LICEA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ACTIVE NETWORK, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5849

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA LUIS

Defendant

ACTIVE NETWORK LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/29/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

5/3/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/4/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPIES

3/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPIES

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance or Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference and Mandatory Chambers Copies); Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACTIVE NETWORK LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J