Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 01:41:21 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, ET AL. VS NESPRESSO USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by LUIS LICEA against NESPRESSO USA, INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6089

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LICEA LUIS

MEJICO BRITTNEY

Defendant

NESPRESSO USA INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

11/26/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff); Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff); Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff); Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff); Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less