This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 02:14:13 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS YARDI SYSTEMS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against YARDI SYSTEMS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8413

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Defendant

YARDI SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERRELL SCOTT JASON

FERRELL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/5/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 08/05/2021

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 08/05/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

11/5/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/05/2021

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Case Management Conference); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Case Reassignment and Case Management Conference); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 2:35 PM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 08/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yardi Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J