This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 19:30:05 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS RE/MAX, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RE/MAX, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2666

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Defendant

RE/MAX LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/8/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Proof of Personal Service

7/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Smith in Support of Demurrer); Filed by Re/Max, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Hurley in Support of Demurrer); Filed by Re/Max, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Re/Max, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RE/MAX, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG