This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 03:32:15 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS PATAGONIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PATAGONIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8861

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Defendant

PATAGONIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERRELL SCOTT J.

FERRELL SCOTT

FERRELL SCOTT JASON

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/10/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/16/2021

8/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/16/2021

Notice of Settlement

8/16/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

11/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 2:24 PM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Patagonia, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATAGONIA INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J