This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 21:17:50 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS NAV TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NAV TECHNOLOGIES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2411

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

LICEA LUIS

Defendants

NAV TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

NAV TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

10/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/13/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

12/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/21/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nav Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Case Management Conference); Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Hurley in Support of Demurrer); Filed by Nav Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Nav Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG