This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 07:12:42 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS JVCKENWOOD USA CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JVCKENWOOD USA CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3742

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Defendant

JVCKENWOOD USA CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

5/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 2ND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 2ND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

3/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint); Filed by JVCKenwood USA Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JVCKenwood USA Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re 2nd Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint); Filed by JVCKenwood USA Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint); Filed by JVCKenwood USA Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT); Filed by JVCKenwood USA Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JVCKENWOOD USA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J