This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 08:03:07 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS IMEDIA BRANDS, INC., A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against IMEDIA BRANDS, INC , A MINNESOTA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9340

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Defendant

IMEDIA BRANDS INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

OROZCO PABLO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/16/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/1/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/25/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

5/25/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

6/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/17/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

9/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Luis Licea, an individual on 08/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Luis Licea, an individual as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 11/03/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 05/25/2022 to 05/25/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/19/2021; Service Cost: 169.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant); As to: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAddress for Scott Ferrell (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: iMedia Brands, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less