This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 19:37:30 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS GIRLFRIEND COLLECTIVE LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GIRLFRIEND COLLECTIVE LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4670

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Defendant

GIRLFRIEND COLLECTIVE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/19/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

5/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Girlfriend Collective LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Girlfriend Collective LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG