This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2022 at 11:39:50 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CONSUMER CELLULAR, INCORPORATED, AN OREGON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 LUIS LICEA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CONSUMER CELLULAR, INCORPORATED, AN OREGON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7093

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LICEA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

LICEA LUIS

Defendants

CONSUMER CELLULAR INCORPORATED AN OREGON CORPORATION

CONSUMER CELLULAR INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

2/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Consumer Cellular, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J