Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 08:51:50 (UTC).

LUIS LARRABURU VS AMERICAN MERCHANDISING SPECIALISTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 LUIS LARRABURU filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN MERCHANDISING SPECIALISTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7704

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRABURU LUIS

Defendants

AMERICAN MERCHANDISING SPECIALISTS INC.

AMERICAN MERCHANDISING SPECIALISTS INC. DBA AMS RETAIL SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPIVAK DAVID GLENN

HAINES WALTER LEWIS

 

Court Documents

Request - PLAINTIFF LUIS LARRABURU'S REQUEST AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

6/23/2021: Request - PLAINTIFF LUIS LARRABURU'S REQUEST AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MEDIATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROMAN SHKODNIK REGARDING CONTINUING THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

6/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROMAN SHKODNIK REGARDING CONTINUING THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/25/2021: Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 05/25/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 05/25/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • Hearing10/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Luis Larraburu's Request and Order To Continue Initial Status Conference Pending Mediation; Filed by Luis Larraburu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Luis Larraburu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Roman Shkodnik Regarding Continuing the Initial Status Conference); Filed by Luis Larraburu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference) of 05/25/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Larraburu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Larraburu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAINES WALTER LEWIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIVAK DAVID G.