This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 00:32:24 (UTC).

LUIS GUZMAN RAMIREZ, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES VS FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 LUIS GUZMAN RAMIREZ, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0634

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS GUZMAN RAMIREZ ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES

Defendant

FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARNAN KEVIN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

KADING THERESA ANN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

6/1/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

Case Management Statement

5/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 03/06/2023

3/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 03/06/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

6/27/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

Case Management Statement

9/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/26/2022: Answer - ANSWER PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IN PENDING CLASS ACTION

4/25/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IN PENDING CLASS ACTION

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/10/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Continuance

3/7/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/9/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (Defendant); As to: Luis Guzman Ramirez, on behalf of himself and other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff); FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Proposed Order: Filed By: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Guzman Ramirez, on behalf of himself and other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/06/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/07/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 36 - Hon. Wendy Changeffective 01/31/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Guzman Ramirez, on behalf of himself and other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Guzman Ramirez, on behalf of himself and other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Luis Guzman Ramirez, on behalf of himself and other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory W. Alarcon in Department 36 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less