This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 07:29:04 (UTC).

LUIS GONZALEZ VS EASY STREET CAPITAL CA, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 LUIS GONZALEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EASY STREET CAPITAL CA, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0210

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ LUIS

Defendants

WESTERN RESOURCES TITLE COMPANY

EASY STREET CAPITAL CA LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TRINITY REDEVELOPMENT INC.

CHAVEZ LESLY A

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

GONZALES ANALISA

BRITO MAIRA

EXP REALTY OF CALIFORNIA INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSS ROBERT M

Defendant Attorney

NEUE MIKE D

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO EASY STREET CAPITAL CA, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; WESTERN RESOURCES TITL

9/30/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO EASY STREET CAPITAL CA, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; WESTERN RESOURCES TITL

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

8/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/16/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Easy Street Capital CA, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company; Old Republic National Title Insurance Company; Western Resources Title Company; Trinity Redevelopment, Inc.; Analisa Gonzales; Lesly A. Chavez, from Complaint); Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Easy Street Capital CA, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN RESOURCES TITLE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EXP REALTY OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic National Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS ROBERT M