This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 03:28:25 (UTC).

LUIS GARCIA CUARENTA VS CESAR PADILLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 LUIS GARCIA CUARENTA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6514

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA CUARENTA LUIS

Defendants

CHINARYAN ANDRANIK

STARS LT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PADILLA CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NATANIAN NAVID A.

OSTROWSKI ALLYSON

Defendant Attorney

HONG LYNDON HYON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2023
  • Hearing12/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cesar Padilla (Defendant); Andranik Chinaryan (Defendant); Stars LT Corp., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cesar Padilla (Defendant); Andranik Chinaryan (Defendant); Stars LT Corp., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Garcia Cuarenta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSTROWSKI ALLYSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATANIAN NAVID A. ESQ.