Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 17:26:34 (UTC).

LUIS EMILIO CHUC PARHAM VS FERNANDO GUADIANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 LUIS EMILIO CHUC PARHAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FERNANDO GUADIANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1403

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHUC PARHAM LUIS EMILIO

Defendants

GUADIANA EMILIO

GUADIANA FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMENEZ DANIEL F

Defendant Attorney

GALANG BRITTON P.

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/7/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/24/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fernando Guadiana (Defendant); Emilio Guadiana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Fernando Guadiana (Defendant); Emilio Guadiana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Emilio Chuc Parham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Luis Emilio Chuc Parham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Emilio Chuc Parham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Emilio Chuc Parham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Emilio Chuc Parham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALANG BRITTON P. ESQ.