Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 13:53:09 (UTC).

LUIS COLINDRES VS ABM AVIATION, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 LUIS COLINDRES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ABM AVIATION, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0343

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLINDRES LUIS

Defendants

AIR SERV CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ABM AVIATION INC. A CORPORATION

ABM AVIATION INC.

AIR SERV CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER J. BERNARD III

Other Attorneys

ALEXANDER III J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • Hearing07/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luis Colindres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Colindres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Luis Colindres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JANVELIAN ALEXANDER