This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 04:00:30 (UTC).

LUIS CEJA, ET AL. VS NATALYA BYZOVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 LUIS CEJA, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NATALYA BYZOVA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, THOMAS D. LONG, DAVID J. COWAN, GARY Y. TANAKA and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5075

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

THOMAS D. LONG

DAVID J. COWAN

GARY Y. TANAKA

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CEJA MARINA E.

CEJA LUIS

CEJA ROSALIA E.

Defendants

BYZOVA NATALYA DBA IMPERIUM LAW CORPORATION

JIMINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL CECILIA

LAW OFFICES OF CECILIA JIMENEZ

DIAB TONY M.

THE LITIGATION PRACTICE GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TONY M. DIAB DBA THE LITIGATION PRACTICE GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GROSS ARNOLD WILLIAM

PYFROM GREGORY COE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

O'MEARA FRANCES MARY

EVANS ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PYFROM, ATTY. FOR PLAINTIFF, MARINA E. CEJA IN SUPP. OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMD. COMPL. REC'D AS EFILED ON 7/25/22; & REQ. FOR LEAVE TO F SAC; [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PYFROM, ATTY. FOR PLAINTIFF, MARINA E. CEJA IN SUPP. OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMD. COMPL. REC'D AS EFILED ON 7/25/22; & REQ. FOR LEAVE TO F SAC; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)

10/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

10/7/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BELANEC, JD, PARALEGAL FOR PYFROM, ATTY FOR PLTF, IN SUPP OF PLTF'S F OF HER SAC REC'D 7/25/22, STEPS TAKEN & 2ND EFILING OF PYFROM DEC & PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BELANEC, JD, PARALEGAL FOR PYFROM, ATTY FOR PLTF, IN SUPP OF PLTF'S F OF HER SAC REC'D 7/25/22, STEPS TAKEN & 2ND EFILING OF PYFROM DEC & PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY C. PYFROM, SR., ATTY FOR PLTF, MARINA E. CEJA, IN SUPP OF PLAINTIFF'S SAC RECEIVED AS EFILED ON 7/25/22 & REQ. FOR ORD FOR LEAVE FOR PLTF CEJA TO AMEND & F HER SAC

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY C. PYFROM, SR., ATTY FOR PLTF, MARINA E. CEJA, IN SUPP OF PLAINTIFF'S SAC RECEIVED AS EFILED ON 7/25/22 & REQ. FOR ORD FOR LEAVE FOR PLTF CEJA TO AMEND & F HER SAC

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GREGORY C. PYFROM, SR., ATTY FOR PLTF, MARINA E. CEJA, IN SUPP OF PLAINTIFF'S SAC RECEIVED AS EFILED ON 7/25/22 & REQ. FOR ORD FOR LEAVE FOR PLTF

9/19/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GREGORY C. PYFROM, SR., ATTY FOR PLTF, MARINA E. CEJA, IN SUPP OF PLAINTIFF'S SAC RECEIVED AS EFILED ON 7/25/22 & REQ. FOR ORD FOR LEAVE FOR PLTF

Case Management Statement

9/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

6/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/21/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/21/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/21/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/22/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Marina E. Ceja, et al. on 10/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Marina E. Ceja as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: Tony M. Diab (Defendant); Tony M. Diab dba The Litigation Practice Group, a California Corporation (Defendant); The Litigation Practice Group, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: The Litigation Practice Group, a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/13/2022; Service Cost: 104.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (2nd); Filed by: Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: Tony M. Diab (Defendant); Tony M. Diab dba The Litigation Practice Group, a California Corporation (Defendant); The Litigation Practice Group, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
154 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Luis Ceja (Plaintiff); Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: Cecilia Jiminez, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/10/2020; Service Cost: 147.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Luis Ceja (Plaintiff); Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Kristen S. Escalante

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Luis Ceja (Plaintiff); Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: Natalya Byzova (Defendant); Cecilia Jiminez, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Ceja (Plaintiff); Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Natalya Byzova (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Ceja (Plaintiff); Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); As to: Rosalia E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Marina E. Ceja (Plaintiff); Natalya Byzova (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******5075 Hearing Date: November 2, 2021 Dept: 17

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

DEPARTMENT 17

TENTATIVE RULING

LUIS CEJA, et al.

vs.

NATALYA BYZOVA DBA IMPERIUM LAW CORPORATION, et al.

Case No.: *******5075

Hearing Date: November 2, 2021

Natalya Byzova dba Imperium Law Corporation’s special motion to strike is GRANTED.

On 11/24/2020, Plaintiffs Luis, Rosalia, and Marina Ceja filed a complaint against Natalya Byzova dba Imperium Law Corporation and Cecilia Jimenez alleging twenty-six causes of action.

On 6/3/2021, Plaintiffs dismissed Cecilia Jimenez and the Law Office of Cecilia Jimenez from this action.

Now, Natalya Byzova dba Imperium Law Corporation (Defendant) move for a special motion to strike Plaintiff’s Complaint.

Legal Standard

A court employs a two-step analysis in determining whether a claim should be stricken under the anti-SLAPP statute. “In the first step, the defendant bears the initial burden of making a prima facie showing that the claim ‘aris[es] from any act of that person in furtherance of the person\'s right of petition or free speech.’ [Citation].” (Lee v. Silveira (2016) 6 Cal.App.5th 527, 538 (Lee).) If the defendant meets this threshold burden, in the second step the burden then shifts to the plaintiff to ‘establish[] that there is a probability that the plaintiff will prevail on the claim.’ [Citation]” (Lee, supra, 6 Cal.App.5th at p. 538.)

Subdivision (e) of section 425.16 provides that an ‘‘act in furtherance of a person’s right of petition or free speech under the United States or California Constitution in connection with a public issue” includes: (1) any written or oral statement or writing made before a legislative, executive, or judicial proceeding, or any other official proceeding authorized by law, (2) any written or oral statement or writing made in connection with an issue under consideration or review by a legislative, executive, or judicial body, or any other official proceeding authorized by law, (3) any written or oral statement or writing made in a place open to the public or a public forum in connection with an issue of public interest, or (4) any other conduct in furtherance of the exercise of the constitutional right of petition or the constitutional right of free speech in connection with a public issue or an issue of public interest.”

Timeliness

Plaintiff contends that Defendant’s motion is untimely. However, given that Plaintiff was able to substantively oppose the motion, the Court finds insufficient evidence of prejudice. Accordingly, the Court considers the motion on its merits.

Factual Background

In November 2019, Marina Ceja filed an unlawful detainer against her father. As part of that action, Marina sought to remove her parents, Luis and Rosalia, from the home which they claimed to own, but which Marina disputed. Several other disputed properties were involved in the litigation.

Defendant here was hired to represent Luis and Rosalia in the action. Because Luis and Rosalia did not speak English, Defendant communicated with her clients through Luis’ daughter, Yolanda Hernandez, who acted as translator throughout the duration of the attorney-client relationship. Because Luis and Rosalia believed they still owned the properties, and that Marina had used fraudulent means to obtain title to the property, they filed a complaint against Marina for: (1) Quiet Title; (2) Slander of Title; (3) Declaratory Relief and Mandatory Injunction; (4) Cancellation of Instrument; (5) Elder Abuse; (6) Fraud and Deceit; (7) Negligent Misrepresentation; (8) Conversion; and (9) Declaratory Relief.

After filing the action for Quiet Title, Byzova, on behalf of her clients, filed a lis pendens for each disputed property. (Byzova Decl., ¶7, Exs. 5-7 in RJN.)

The claim here is now asserted by Marina, Luis, and Rosalia, on the grounds that Defendant induced Luis and Rosalia to execute verifications written in English only, and thereafter filed and served a complaint with the signed verifications from them that they didn’t understand, and filed a false complaint which disparaged Marina’s title to the properties.

Discussion

As a preliminary matter, Plaintiff, in opposition, agreed to voluntarily withdraw her 22nd, 24th, and 25 causes of action against Defendant. This leaves only the 23rd cause of action for slander of title and 26th cause of action for abuse of process.

I. Protected Activity

Defendant argues that Plaintiff’s causes of action against her arise out of protected activity because the gravamen of the claims against her concern her prior legal representation of Plaintiffs Luis and Rosalia during which time she filed a complaint for quiet title on behalf of Plaintiffs Luis and Rosalia and filed the required lis pendens for the properties at issue.

Plaintiff’s first cause of action here is based on allegations that:

Defendants Natalya Byzova and Does 1-1 00, and each of them, published, in an unprivileged, malicious manner, false statements that disparaged Marina E. Ceja’s title to the Ceja Properties commonly known as: (a) the real property commonly known as 14955 Foothill Blvd., Sylmar, CA 91342 (APN 2502-002-004); (b) the real property commonly known as 43938 Hinkley Road, Hinkley, CA 92347 (APN 0489-241-05-0000); and (c) the real property commonly known as 12528 San Fernando Road, Sylmar, CA 91342 (APN 2506-035-009) (\'"Ceja Properties") and have thereby caused Marina E. Ceja pecuniary loss. Said disparagement affected, restricted, or injured the salability of the Ceja Properties. As a result of the disparagement, Marina E. Ceja has suffered financial loss as a result according to proof.

(Complaint ¶ 189.)

Given that this cause of action is based on Defendant’s filing of a legal complaint for quiet title, it clearly targets a “… writing made before a… judicial proceeding….” (CCP ; 425.16, subd. (e).)

Similarly, Plaintiff’s second cause of action is based on allegations that:

Defendants Natalya Byzova and Does 1-100, and each of them wrongfully induced Mr. & Mrs. Luis Ceja to execute verifications written in English only, and thereafter filed and served a complaint with the signed verifications for the matter entitled, Luis C. Ceja, Rosalia Escalera Ceja aka Rosa Ceja vs. Marina Escalera Ceja aka Marina E. Ceja; United Wholesale Mortgage Case LASC Case No. 19CHV00989 along with filing and recording of at least three (3) lis pendens against the Ceja Properties without Mr. & Mrs. Luis Ceja’s consent or knowledge. Marina E. Ceja was required to defend herself in the matter entitled, Luis C. Ceja, Rosalia Escalera Ceja aka Rosa Ceja vs. Marina Escalera Ceja aka Marina E. Ceja; United Wholesale Mortgage Case LASC Case No. 19CHV00989 and to deal with the ramifications of the filing and/or recording of at least three (3) lis pendens against the Ceja Properties.

(Complaint ¶ 200.)

Given that this cause of action is based on Defendant’s filing of lis pendens connected with an pending lawsuit , it clearly targets a “…writing made in connection with an issue under consideration or review by a … judicial body….” (CCP ; 425.16, subd. (e); See La Jolla Group II v. Bruce (2012) 211 Cal.App.4th 461, 471.)

In sum, the Court concludes that Defendants’ evidence establishes that the claims against them arise out of protected activity. Having satisfied their burden to show that Plaintiffs’ claim arises from an act in furtherance of the person’s right of petition, the burden shifts to Plaintiffs to establish a probability that the Plaintiffs will prevail on the claim. (Lee, supra, 6 Cal.App.5th at p. 538.)

II. Probability of Success

Civil Code section 47(b) provides an absolute privilege for communications made in any legislative proceeding, in any judicial proceeding, in any other official proceeding authorized by law, or in the initiation or course of any other proceeding authorized by law. (See Civ. Code, ; 47(b); Hagberg v. California Federal Bank FSB (2004) 32 Cal.4th 350, 360.) Section 47(b) bars all tort causes of action except malicious prosecution. (See Hagberg, supra, 32 Cal.4th at 360.) Section 47(b) only applies to communicative acts, not tortious conduct. (Id. at 423.) “The threshold issue in determining whether the litigation privilege applies is whether the defendant’s conduct was communicative or noncommunicative.” (Id.)

California Courts have applied the absolute privilege of Civil Code section 47(b) to the recording of lis pendens. As noted in La Jolla Group II, supra, 211 Cal.App.4th at p. 725, “[i]f the publication has a reasonable relation to the action and is permitted by law, the absolute privilege attaches. [] It therefore attaches to the recordation of a notice of lis pendens, for such a publication is permitted by law, and like other documents that may be filed in an action, it has a reasonable relation thereto and it is immaterial that it is recorded with the county recorder instead of being filed with the county clerk.”

California Courts have also applied the absolute privilege to abuse of process claims where the gravamen of the cause of action is based on communicative acts. For example, in Rusheen v. Cohen (2006) 37 Cal.4th 1048, a lower court had concluded that defendant’s conduct was not absolutely privileged because the complaint targeted the wrongful act of levying on property in the execution of a judgment and thus was not communicative. Our Supreme Court reversed that ruling, concluding that:

On close analysis, the gravamen of the action was not the levying act, but the procurement of the judgment based on the use of allegedly perjured declarations of service. Because these declarations were communications “(1) made in judicial or quasi-judicial proceedings; (2) by litigants or other participants authorized by law; (3) to achieve the objects of the litigation; and (4) that have some connection or logical relation to the action” (Silberg supra, 50 Cal.3d at p. 212, 266 Cal.Rptr. 638, 786 P.2d 365), the litigation privilege applies to the declarations and protects against torts arising from the privileged declarations. (Id. at p. 214, 266 Cal.Rptr. 638, 786 P.2d 365.) Moreover, as Cohen argues, since a party may not be liable for submitting false testimony or evidence in the course of judicial proceedings which are used to obtain a judgment, the party should likewise be immune from abuse of process claims for subsequent acts necessary to enforce it. Otherwise, application of the litigation privilege would be thwarted. Thus, where the gravamen of the complaint is a privileged communication (i.e., allegedly perjured declarations of service) the privilege extends to necessarily related noncommunicative acts (i.e., act of levying).

(Rusheen, supra, 128 P.3d at p. 722)

Here, similarly, Plaintiffs’ allegations against Defendant are that she “induced Mr & Mrs. Luis Ceja to execute verifications written in English only, and thereafter filed and served a complaint with the signed verifications for the matter entitled.” (Complaint ¶ 200.) Thus, Plaintiffs’ abuse of process cause of action is clearly concerned with the communicative act of obtaining and filing allegedly false verifications as part of the Complaint. These communications are privileged. (Rusheen, supra, 128 P.3d at p. 722.)

In opposition, Plaintiffs repeatedly advance arguments which speak to the merits of their underlying allegations, and contend that Plaintiff improperly relied upon Yolanda Hernandez as a Spanish translator. However, the litigation privilege is not concerned with whether or not the underlying alleged conduct was wrong, but rather the type of communication that it was and its underlying purpose.

The cases cited to by Plaintiff do not persuade the Court otherwise. For example, Plaintiff cites to Benasra v. Mitchell Silverberg & Knupp LLP (2004) 123 Cal.App.4th 1179 to argue that breaches of a professional duty do not fall within the purview of section 425.16. However, in that case, a law firm was being sued for violating the Rules of Professional Conduct with respect to conflicts of interest, and was not “based on written oral statements made on [client’s] behalf in the arbitration.” (Benasra, supra, 123 Cal.App.4th at p. 1186.) Here, by contrast, the Court is limited to the allegations of the Complaint, and Plaintiffs do not allege a breach of loyalty or a breach of the Rules of Professional Conduct. Plaintiffs also do not assert any cause of action for legal malpractice. Rather, Plaintiffs assert causes of action for slander of title—which is based on the very act of filing a complaint for quiet tile and filing lis pendens—and thus is undeniably related to writing made by Defendant on her clients’ behalf—and on abuse process which is similarly based on the act of filing lis pendens and written verifications with the Court.

Accordingly, the communications at issue here are absolutely privileged, and Defendant is immune from liability on the basis of these communications. Because these communications form the basis of Plaintiffs’ claims against Defendant, Plaintiffs cannot establish a probability of prevailing of their claims against Defendant.

Based on the foregoing, Defendant’s anti-SLAPP motion is granted.

It is so ordered.

Dated: November , 2021

Hon. Jon R. Takasugi Judge of the Superior Court

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at smcdept17@lacourt.org by 4 p.m. the day prior as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If all parties to a motion submit, the court will adopt this tentative as the final order. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.

Due to Covid-19, the court is strongly discouraging in-person appearances. Parties, counsel, and court reporters present are subject to temperature checks and health inquiries, and will be denied entry if admission could create a public health risk. The court encourages the parties wishing to argue to appear via L.A. Court Connect. For more information, please contact the court clerk at (213) 633-0517. Your understanding during these difficult times is appreciated.

'