Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:48:50 (UTC).

LUIS CALDERON ET AL VS NIZED KHALILI

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 LUIS CALDERON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NIZED KHALILI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5691

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AALIYAH WAKEELAH

CALDERON LUIS

Defendants and Respondents

KHALILI NIZED

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CALHOUN ERIC G.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/26/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

10/19/2017: Minute Order -

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1) VIOLATIONS OF THE UNRUH ACT (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51, ET SEQ.); OR ETC

3/28/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1) VIOLATIONS OF THE UNRUH ACT (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51, ET SEQ.); OR ETC

SUMMONS -

3/28/2017: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

4/10/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT NIZED KHALILI, TRUSTEE OF THE KHALILI TRUST DATED AUGUST 10, 2014

6/16/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT NIZED KHALILI, TRUSTEE OF THE KHALILI TRUST DATED AUGUST 10, 2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/28/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/11/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/26/2017: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/26/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order pursuant to OSC) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nized Khalili (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis Calderon (Plaintiff); Wakeelah Aaliyah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1) VIOLATIONS OF THE UNRUH ACT (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51, ET SEQ.); OR ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric G Calhoun