Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 06:56:53 (UTC).

LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES VS TRIMMING LAND CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRIMMING LAND CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9309

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES

Defendants

TLC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

TRIMMING LAND COMPANY A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

TRIMMING LAND COMPANY INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

TRIMMING LAND CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYAB DAVID

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

6/9/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

6/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LUIS ANTONIO ALEXANDRES FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIMMING LAND CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYAB DAVID