This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 03:41:07 (UTC).

LUIS A SOLORZANO VS COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LA COUNTY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 LUIS A SOLORZANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LA COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1419

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOLORZANO LUIS A.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 500

COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KAPLAN JONATHON ESQ.

KAPLAN JONATHON HOWARD ESQ.

WEISS YITZ ERIK

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JOHNSON ADAM L. ESQ.

MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT LLP

BRETHEN GEOFFREY CHESTER

JOHNSON ADAM LEWIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

8/17/2020: Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DISCRIMINATION ;ETC

4/10/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DISCRIMINATION ;ETC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

8/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Brief - BRIEF SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION

7/17/2020: Brief - BRIEF SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE DIANNE MCGIVERN, CSR #7576

7/10/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE DIANNE MCGIVERN, CSR #7576

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDI

6/18/2020: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDI

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTYS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

6/18/2020: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTYS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/22/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 09/25/2019

9/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 09/25/2019

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER ALLEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER ALLEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement

9/27/2019: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CORRESP...)

10/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CORRESP...)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/8/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/17/2018: DEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS -

4/10/2018: SUMMONS -

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • Hearing04/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Hearing04/06/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Hearing12/18/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department STL-C at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; MSC Timeslot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docketat 09:59 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Mandatory Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Mandatory Settlement) of 10/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Luis A. Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 09/03/2020, FSC Trial Readiness Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County Sanitation Districts of Los (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICTS OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Luis A. Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) DISCRIMINATION ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luis A. Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701419    Hearing Date: July 10, 2020    Dept: 26

IN ORDER TO IMPLEMENT PHYSICAL DISTANCING AND UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE, THE COURT STRONGLY ENCOURAGES ALL COUNSEL AND ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR NON-TRIAL AND NON-EVIDENTIARY MATTERS, INCLUDING THIS MOTION.

 

In its supplemental reply, Defendant argues “[t]he Districts repeatedly requested that Plaintiff provide medical documentation of any “need for accommodation,” but he never did so. (Supp. Reply p. 6.) The court requests that Counsel for Defendant be prepared to identify citations to the record that document each occasion on which Defendant requested medical documentation of any need for accommodation. For each citation, Defense Counsel should be prepared to identify the filing date, the name of the document, and the page number.

In its supplemental reply, Defendant argues “[t]he Districts repeatedly requested medical documentation from Plaintiff regarding what limitations, if any, he had as part of his sleep apnea and “not severe” diabetes.” (Supp. Reply p. 7.) The court requests that Counsel for Defendant be prepared to identify citations to the record that document each occasion on which Defendant requested medical documentation of Plaintiff’s limitations as a result of his sleep apnea and diabetes. For each citation, Defense Counsel should be prepared to identify the filing date, the name of the document, and the page number.

The court requests that Counsel for Plaintiff be prepared to identify citations to the record that document each occasion on which Plaintiff provided medical documentation to Defendant.

The court requests that Counsel for Defendant be prepared to identify citations to the record that document each accommodation that Defendant offered to Plaintiff for his diabetes and sleep apnea. For each citation, Defense Counsel should be prepared to identify the filing date, the name of the document, and the page number.

Evidentiary Objections

Plaintiff’s Objections

Plaintiff objects to portions of the declaration of Jennifer Allan, portions of the deposition of Basil Hewitt, and Exhibit 24 to the Deposition of Luis Solorzano (Vol II). The Court rules as follows on these objections:

Objection 1to Allen Decl. ¶ 4, page 2, lines 11-12: Overruled

Objection 2 to Allen Decl. ¶ 4, page 2, lines 12-13: Overruled

Objection 3 to Hewitt Depo., at page 67, lines 9-11: Sustained as to “all” for lack of foundation. Overruled to the extent that Hewitt is referring to her own observations.

Objection 4 to Exhibit 24 to the Deposition of Luis Solorzano (Vol II): Sustained, Hearsay

Defendant’s Objections

Defendant objects to portions of the declaration of Plaintiff.  The Court rules as follows on these objections:

Objection 1 to Solorzano Decl. ¶ 4, lines 15-17: Overruled

Objection 2 to Solorzano Decl. ¶ 4, lines 18-19: Overruled

Objection 3 to Solorzano Decl. ¶ 6, lines 27-2: Overruled

Case Number: BC701419    Hearing Date: June 23, 2020    Dept: 26

Pursuant to the Court’s First Amended General Order re Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil, filed on May 3, 2019, “[e]lectronic documents must be electronically filed in PDF, text searchable format when technologically feasible without impairment of the document’s image.” (First Amended General Order re Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil, 5/3/19 [italics added].) Here, Defendant has filed a declaration of Adam L. Johnson in support of its motion for summary judgment and/or summary adjudication that is approximately 226 pages long and consists primarily of exhibits that are not text searchable, which has made the court’s review of this evidence very difficult. Nor has Defendant provided a courtesy copy of the declaration of Adam L. Johnson. Defendant is ordered to re-file the declaration of Adam L. Johnson and attached exhibits in text searchable format on or before 8 am on June 23, 2020.

No dispositive tentative ruling is issued at this time. The parties may appear at the hearing on June 23, 2020 at 2:00 pm to present oral arguments, or the parties may submit on the papers.

If any party wishes to submit on the papers, please email the clerk at SMCdept26@lacourt.org (and “cc” all other parties in the same email) no later than 7:30 am on the day of the hearing, and please notify all other parties in advance that you will not be appearing at the hearing. Include the words "SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS" in all caps in the subject line and include your name, contact information, the case number, and the party you represent in the body of the email.

IF ANY PARTY CHOOSES TO APPEAR FOR THIS MOTION, THE COURT STRONGLY ENCOURAGES ALL COUNSEL AND ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR NON-TRIAL AND NON-EVIDENTIARY MATTERS, INCLUDING THIS MOTION.