Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 19:16:09 (UTC).

LUHMAN, DANIEL FREDRICK -CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 LUHMAN, DANIEL FREDRICK -CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0264

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUHMAN TINA MICHELLE

Not Classified By Court

LUHMAN DANIEL FREDRICK

PROBATE INVESTIGATORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HOLLOWAY TAMIEL S.

 

Court Documents

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

6/2/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Report - Court Appointed Counsel

6/4/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

6/7/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

5/17/2021: Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

1/12/2021: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

1/12/2021: Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/12/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Citation - issued

1/12/2021: Citation - issued

Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB00264

1/13/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB00264

Notice - Related Cases - BP065488

1/13/2021: Notice - Related Cases - BP065488

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

1/14/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Order - Appointing Counsel

1/14/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • Hearing09/14/2021 at 1:30 PM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Appoint Successor Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial) filed on January 12, 2021 by Tina Michelle Luhman. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCitation (issued ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBATE INVESTIGATORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOWAY TAMIEL S.